This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/05/2020 at 12:35:33 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N .A. VS PAOLA DEL VALLE

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PAOLA DEL VALLE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N .A.

Defendant

DEL VALLE, PAOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice:

11/28/2018 - Notice:

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Affidavit as to Costs

05/16/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Service Returned

02/16/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

01/02/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Summons Returned - No Service

01/04/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

03/12/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

02/01/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Default Final Judgment

05/31/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

05/16/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Indebtedness

05/16/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Memorandum of Disposition

04/23/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Default Final Judgment

05/31/2019 - Default Final Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31476:4769; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DEL VALLE PAOLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketDefault Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31476:4343; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DEL VALLE PAOLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100251AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/02/2019 REGISTER#:310CASHIER:MARIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DEL VALLE PAOLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550146AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL 806 DOUGALS RDSOUTH TOWER, SUITE 200 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less