This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/03/2019 at 11:23:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A VS FELIPE J PALACIO

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELIPE J PALACIO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Defendant

PALACIO, FELIPE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

12/28/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Non-Military Affidavit

04/15/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Memorandum of Disposition

03/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

01/18/2019 - Service Returned

Final Judgment by Judge

04/23/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Affidavit as to Costs

04/15/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice:

11/28/2018 - Notice:

Affidavit of Indebtedness

04/15/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31423:436; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PALACIO FELIPE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100020AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/02/2019 REGISTER#:310CASHIER:MARIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PALACIO FELIPE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550139AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL 806 DOUGALS RDSOUTH TOWER, SUITE 200 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less