This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/26/2019 at 01:18:15 (UTC).

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

CORDERO, ARJELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

Orta, Michael P.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Law

04/15/2019 - Memorandum of Law

Notice of Unavailability/absence

04/10/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion:

03/01/2019 - Motion:

Objection:

02/01/2019 - Objection:

Objection:

02/01/2019 - Objection:

Motion to Dismiss

02/01/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Filing:

02/01/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Memorandum of Disposition

01/14/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order of Recusal

01/14/2019 - Order of Recusal

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/14/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

01/11/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

01/11/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

12/14/2018 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

12/04/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

11/29/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/29/2018 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

11/29/2018 - Statement of Claim

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Law; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2280049AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$390.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/04/2018 REGISTER#:228CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560101AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:EMILIO R STILLO 7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203 DAVIE FL 33314-4105 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less