This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/24/2019 at 12:59:24 (UTC).

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

MENDEZ, JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

Montgomery, Daniel S

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

02/14/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Memorandum of Disposition

01/28/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion:

03/07/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

03/04/2019 - Motion:

Request for Production

12/14/2018 - Request for Production

Memorandum

04/05/2019 - Memorandum

Notice of Appearance

02/14/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Objection:

03/13/2019 - Objection:

Notice of Appearance

01/25/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Statement of Claim

12/14/2018 - Statement of Claim

Objection:

03/13/2019 - Objection:

Request for Admissions

12/14/2018 - Request for Admissions

Order of Recusal

01/25/2019 - Order of Recusal

Motion:

03/13/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Service of Process

01/17/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

12/28/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DISMISS...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; Montgomery Daniel S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; Montgomery Daniel S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800059AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$430.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2018 REGISTER#:280CASHIER:IAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480018AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:EMILIO R STILLO 7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203 DAVIE FL 33314-4105 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.