This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/22/2019 at 11:17:56 (UTC).

BROWARD INS RECOVERY CENTER (LLC) VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 BROWARD INS RECOVERY CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Broward Ins Recovery Center (LLC)

Assignor

Avci, Dilay

Defendant

Progressive Select Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

PFEFFER, JESSICA L.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

02/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion to Dismiss

03/01/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

01/08/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Request for Production

11/28/2018 - Request for Production

Pre Trial Summons

12/20/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

11/28/2018 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

02/21/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/11/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

05/10/2019 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Motion:

02/28/2019 - Motion:

Objection:

03/12/2019 - Objection:

Motion for Protective Order

03/12/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2150034AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/24/2018 REGISTER#:215CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500128AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:EMILIO R STILLO 7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203 DAVIE FL 33314-4105 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less