This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/05/2020 at 12:16:45 (UTC).

BEHAR, ERIC RUBEN VS MASLOVA, ELENA

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 BEHAR, ERIC RUBEN filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against MASLOVA, ELENA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Behar, Eric Ruben

Respondent

Maslova, Elena

Minors

Behar, Sasha

Behar, Michelle Sasha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pacheco, Norma I.

Respondent Attorneys

Bango Diaz, Patricia

Genet, Sandor F.

 

Court Documents

EFinal Judgment by Judge

05/01/2020 - EFinal Judgment by Judge

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Family Court Services Status Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURT ORDERED REFERRAL & COMPLIANCE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECO...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: EFinal Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31923:3966; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITIONER/FATHER'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF TIMESHARING AND THE RESPONDENT/MOTHER'S COUNT-PETITION TO PETITIONER/FATHER'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6/3/20 AT 1 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5/4/20 AT 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5-4-20 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6-3-20 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing Before General Magistrate; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5-4-20 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing Before General Magistrate; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6-3-20 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to General Magistrate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960009AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/13/2018 REGISTER#:296CASHIER:CAVILEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Issued for Process Server Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Maslova Elena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Designating Primary Email Address; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less