This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/12/2018 at 03:12:50 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA (NA) VS COLOMBO, UGO

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COLOMBO, UGO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Bank Of America (na)

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

COLOMBO, UGO

US CHALLENGER LLC

Robins, Craig

Cl36 Leasing (llc)

Dacra Development Corp

Uc Challenger (llc)

Counter Defendants

Valentini, Massimo

Columbo, Ugo

Murphy, Arthur J

3Rd Party Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

CL 36 Leasing LLC

Robins, Craig

Dacra Development Corp

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

CMC Group Inc

Columbo, Ugo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUAN A GONZALEZ (ESQ)

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Zack, David J

Crockett, Jeffrey B.

Hall, Alexander J

Kendall B Coffey

Laurel White Marc-Charles

Hall, Andrew C

Cuneo, Frank P

Dorta, Gonzalo R.

Defendant, Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Crockett, Jeffrey B.

Giller, Jason B

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

05/21/2018 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/22/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Order:

02/09/2018 - Order:

Objection:

02/05/2018 - Objection:

Notice:

01/16/2018 - Notice:

Notice of Hearing-

12/18/2017 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Hearing

03/08/2017 - Request for Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

01/11/2017 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

12/29/2016 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing:

10/31/2016 - Notice of Filing:

Memorandum of Disposition

09/22/2016 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

05/06/2016 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

03/10/2016 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Response:

01/08/2016 - Response:

Service Returned

12/14/2015 - Service Returned

Motion to Dismiss

10/08/2015 - Motion to Dismiss

Text

10/01/2013 - Text

Motion for Default

08/23/2013 - Motion for Default

302 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: 8/03/2018 CONTINUED T- CAL 2/05/2019 FOR 2-3 DAYS 6/20/2018 T- CALENDAR 10/02/2018 OF 2-3 DAYS BA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UGO COLOMBO'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIM AND ASSERT CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEC 10, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandate From Appeals Court; Book/Page: 31135:1168; Event Type: Event; Comments: (PETITION DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Leave; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
357 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2016
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less