This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/29/2020 at 11:11:53 (UTC).

ARROYO, MARCO A VS PEREZ, ISMERY R

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 ARROYO, MARCO A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PEREZ, ISMERY R. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Arroyo, Marco A

Respondent

Perez, Ismery R

Minor

Arroyo, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Diaz, Nory

Respondent Attorney

Cabrera, Monica M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: FINAL FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY,COUNTER-PETITION FOR PATERNITY OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketAgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY OTHER RELIEF COUNTER-PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOrder of Referral to Hearing Officer; Event Type: Event; Comments: CHILD SUPPORT, ROBERT SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOrder of Referral to General Magistrate; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR THE DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY AND FOR OTHER RELIEF ( DATED NOVEMBER 28, 2019 )GEN MAG. ROBERT SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketSettlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMediator's Report of Partial Mediated Agreement; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED, JUNE 27, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event; Comments: 06/27/19 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketMediation Division Report Reset Agreed By All Parties; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED FOR 05-31-2014910:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: ISMERY PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2280008AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2018 REGISTER#:228CASHIER:ANDELLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490014AMT PAID:$301.00 NAME:DIAZ, NORY 8950 SW 74TH CT STE 2201 A-76 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$301.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Indigent Status Approved; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketApplication/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketMotion for Emergency Pick-Up Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketRequired Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less