This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/22/2019 at 12:46:49 (UTC).

ANUBHAV MEHROTRA VS. LOIS MOONEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 ANUBHAV MEHROTRA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOIS MOONEY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEHROTRA, ANUBHAV

Defendants

MOONEY, CYNTHIA

MOONEY, LOIS

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shipp, Ryan Scott

Defendant Attorney

Noel, Guerby

 

Court Documents

Order:

02/28/2019 - Order:

Indigent Payment

01/17/2019 - Indigent Payment

Order:

03/01/2019 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

01/10/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Complaint

12/13/2018 - Complaint

Certificate of Service

03/06/2019 - Certificate of Service

Memorandum of Disposition

01/17/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Answer

12/21/2018 - Answer

Response to Motion

01/02/2019 - Response to Motion

Non-Military Affidavit

12/28/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Order:

01/17/2019 - Order:

Order of Dismissal

05/02/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Service Returned

12/20/2018 - Service Returned

Stipulation

02/19/2019 - Stipulation

Non-Military Affidavit

12/28/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Returned

12/20/2018 - Service Returned

Motion to Strike

12/28/2018 - Motion to Strike

Service Returned

12/20/2018 - Service Returned

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31434:2314; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANUBHAV MEHROTRA C/O LAW OFFICE OF RYAN S. SHIPP, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPROVING TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF AGREED STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2880002AMT PAID:$25.50 NAME:LOIS MOONEY COMMENT:CLERK FEE INDGENT ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$25.50$25.50 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$25.50 RECEIPT DATE:03/01/2019 REGISTER#:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2880001AMT PAID:$1,200.00 NAME:CYNTHIA MOONEY 1660 SE 29TH ST APT 107 HOMESTEAD, FL 33035 COMMENT:RENT DEPOSIT ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1 $1,200.00 $1,200.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPROVING TERMS OF CONDITIONS OF THE AGREED STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240002AMT PAID:$25.50 NAME:CYNTHIA MOONEY COMMENT:CLERK'S FEE INDIGENTALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$25.50$25.50 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$25.50 RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2019 REG

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MEHROTRA ANUBHAV; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MEHROTRA ANUBHAV; MOONEY LOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MEHROTRA ANUBHAV; MOONEY CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3470127AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:SHIPP, RYAN SCOTT 814 LANTANA RD STE 1 LANTANA FL 33462-1553 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.