This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/16/2018 at 21:42:17 (UTC).

ALMASE, CAESAR V VS PEREZ, SERGIO

Case Summary

On 08/01/2013 ALMASE, CAESAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VS PEREZ, SERGIO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALMASE, CAESAR V

GARCIA, RHODALYN

ALMASE, KRISTINA

Almase, Kristina (Estate of) (Dec'd)

Defendants

PEREZ, SERGIO

BARLATIER, RODNEY

DUMEL, WILLIE

DTG Operations Inc

Cason, Cheryl

Thirfty Car Rental

Dollar Thrifty Automobile Group Inc

Dollar Rent a CAr Systems Inc

Rinon ORtiz, Dennis Ryan (Estate of) (Dec'd)

Key, Jeffrey

Rantal Car Finance Corp

Rachelle, Mary (Personal Rep)

Thirfty Car Rental Finance Corporation

Baker, Kevin, Sr

Henson, Norman, Jr

City Of Opa Locka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARD ROBERT BLUMBERG

Blumberg, Edward Robert

Defendant Attorneys

Oscar Edmund Marrero

John Wilke

Luis A Botero, Esq

Philip E Glatzer

Timothy F Malin

Jeffrey W Johnson

Shawn J Davis

Calhoon, Heather Marie

Daniel J Santaniello

E Bruce Johnson

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

08/30/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Filing:

07/18/2017 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/24/2017 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice:

05/24/2017 - Notice:

Request:

03/03/2017 - Request:

Request for Production

02/16/2017 - Request for Production

Request for Production

02/16/2017 - Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

12/21/2016 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

12/19/2016 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Taking Deposition

10/26/2016 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request:

08/01/2016 - Request:

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/04/2016 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/28/2016 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

11/23/2015 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Hearing-

06/16/2015 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Interrogatory

06/09/2015 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

05/05/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

08/01/2013 - Notice of Interrogatory

652 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Subpoena; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Subpoena; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Subpoena; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
682 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less