This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/13/2018 at 02:46:19 (UTC).

ALL FACTORING DE VENEZUELA C A VS ATMOSPHERE FUND SPC (LTD)

Case Summary

On 04/04/2013 ALL FACTORING DE VENEZUELA C A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ATMOSPHERE FUND SPC LTD. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL FACTORING DE VENEZUELA C A

Defendants

ATMOSPHERE FUND SPC LTD

CP CAPITAL SECURITIES

INVERSIONES 1590 C A

AMICORP FUND SVCS N V

PROFESSIONALES DE BOLSA

IACHINI, ARMANDO

LITWAK, MARTIN

WOLKOWIEZ, LUIS

REYES, JORGE

RIPEPI, RICARDO

Atmosphere Fund Spc (ltd)

Construcciones Yamaro Ca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

EDWARD H DAVIS, JR.

Miller, Nyana

David Allan Freedman

Lowy, Ronald S.

Klein, Robert Michael

Dennis, Kevin

Lopez, Anthony M

Eric J Strauss

Eduardo F Rodriguez (esq)

Miller, Robert M.

Page, Noelle Melissa

Robert I Chaskes Esq

De La Pena, Leoncio E.

Sanchez, Francisco Oscar

John Otto Sutton

Spahn, Eva M

Mark, Etan

Gregory S Glasser

A George Gutierrez

 

Court Documents

Order:

08/13/2018 - Order:

Response to Request for Admissions

07/20/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Voluntary Dismissal

06/13/2018 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Taking Deposition

02/08/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/19/2016 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Hearing-

11/09/2015 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

04/17/2015 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Summary Judgment

04/03/2015 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Hearing-

03/10/2015 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice:

02/17/2015 - Notice:

Request for Hearing

12/19/2014 - Request for Hearing

Request for Hearing

10/10/2014 - Request for Hearing

Certificate of Service

10/07/2014 - Certificate of Service

Notice:

09/18/2014 - Notice:

Response to Request for Production

09/03/2014 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/14/2014 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Order on Motion to Compel

12/09/2013 - Order on Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

12/09/2013 - Order on Motion to Compel

774 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: 1-2 DAY N/J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 20, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED. SEE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
911 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Hearing Info: Transfer Calendar; Hearing Code: TRAN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less