This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 14:41:53 (UTC).

ALIS, LLC VS. KARIA GOMEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 ALIS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KARIA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

Alis, LLC

Defendants

Gomez, Rosaura

Gomez, Karia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Delgado, Ceasar X

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

02/01/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

01/31/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

01/30/2019 - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

01/30/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Default

01/08/2019 - Default

Motion for Default

01/04/2019 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

01/04/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

01/04/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Returned

12/28/2018 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/28/2018 - Service Returned

Complaint

12/12/2018 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gomez Karia; Gomez Rosaura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31317:2238; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gomez Karia; Gomez Rosaura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gomez Karia; Gomez Rosaura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2290036AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2018 REGISTER#:229CASHIER:CAREYSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gomez Karia; Gomez Rosaura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500022AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:DELGADO, CEASAR X 8000 SW 117TH AVE STE 206 MIAMI FL 33183-4809 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less