This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/23/2019 at 16:38:58 (UTC).

ALAN H MANDELL VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 ALAN H MANDELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANDELL CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE

MANDELL, ALAN H

Assignor

Thompson, Evelyn

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Flaxman

Defendant Attorney

Narcy Fajardo, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

01/09/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Voluntary Dismissal

02/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/10/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Memorandum of Disposition

03/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice:

02/18/2019 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

01/30/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Pre Trial Summons

12/21/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31354:858; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Narcy Fajardo Esq.; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2900018AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$260.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/21/2018 REGISTER#:290CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; MANDELL ALANH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530060AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:CHARLES FLAXMAN 5715 JOHNSON ST HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-5633 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less