This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/14/2018 at 02:31:09 (UTC).

AGRO SUPPLY SA VS CURBELO, JUAN

Case Summary

On 05/01/2013 AGRO SUPPLY SA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CURBELO, JUAN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGRO SUPPLY SA

Quercia, Antonio

Defendants

CURBELO, JUAN

CURBELO, JOSE M

AGRI COMMODITY TRADE LLC

AGRITRADE LP

AGRI CONSULTANTS LLC

AGRITRADE LENDING SA

OLIVARES, LUIS ANDRES

WULFF, RITA G

SIERRA, RUBEN

STUYCK, DANIELA

Galo Group Limited

Agritrade Investments Ltd

Agricultural Svcs Llc

Garnishees

Perlman,Bajandas,Yevoli & Albright, P.L.

Bank Of America, N.A.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

JPMorgan Chase & CO.,

Mercantile Commercebank Florida Bankcorp, Inc

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALFREDO G DURAN

Strauss, Ronald I.

Gail A Mcquilkin

Feinberg, Dyanne Elyce

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Paul D

Evans, D. Porpoise

Cantero, Raoul G., III

Hernandez, Eric A

Garnishee Attorneys

Diaz-Noa, Ana

Kent, John B

Wargo, Joseph Duane

Mariola C. Triana

 

Court Documents

Order:

09/09/2016 - Order:

Answer of Garnishee

06/13/2016 - Answer of Garnishee

Order:

02/10/2016 - Order:

Notice:

02/02/2016 - Notice:

Motion for Protective Order

01/13/2016 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice:

11/02/2015 - Notice:

Motion to Quash

11/02/2015 - Motion to Quash

Answer of Garnishee

10/09/2015 - Answer of Garnishee

Writ of Garnishment Issued

10/05/2015 - Writ of Garnishment Issued

Notice of Taking Deposition

09/14/2015 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion to Quash

02/09/2015 - Motion to Quash

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/09/2015 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Taking Deposition

12/15/2014 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/02/2014 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

03/07/2014 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

11/12/2013 - Order Extending Time for

Motion:

09/11/2013 - Motion:

Notice of Filing:

06/27/2013 - Notice of Filing:

732 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31118:374; Event Type: Event; Comments: TAX COSTS, TAX APPELLATE COSTS Parties: Curbelo Juan; Agritrade Lp; Agritrade Lending Sa; Agricultural Svcs Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO TAX COSTS & TAX APPELLATE COSTS. GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response; Event Type: Event; Comments: RENEWED OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING ENTITLEMENT TO TRIAL AND APPELLATE COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Tax Cost; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
836 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less