Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/11/2019 at 22:31:24 (UTC).

907 EUCLID LLC VS. TOMMASO GAMBINI

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 907 EUCLID LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TOMMASO GAMBINI. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

907 EUCLID LLC

Defendant

GAMBINI, TOMMASO

Not Classified By Court

EVICITION PROPERTY

 

Court Documents

Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

02/05/2019 - Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

Order of Dismissal

02/05/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies

02/05/2019 - Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies

Motion to Dismiss

02/05/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Mediators Report

01/29/2019 - Mediators Report

Order:

01/29/2019 - Order:

Order:

01/23/2019 - Order:

Service Returned

01/02/2019 - Service Returned

Motion to Strike

12/26/2018 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Default

12/26/2018 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

12/26/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Non-Payment

12/26/2018 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Affidavit as to Costs

12/26/2018 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion:

12/24/2018 - Motion:

Answer

12/19/2018 - Answer

Complaint

12/14/2018 - Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • Mediation; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: L&T MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: 907 EUCLID LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31322:1464; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIP Parties: GAMBINI TOMMASO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: STIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: 907 EUCLID LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediators Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: DFT FTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE-SETTING MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: SETTING MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO DEPOSIST IN COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GAMBINI TOMMASO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Filed at North Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GAMBINI TOMMASO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2810002AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$195.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/14/201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Hearing Info: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less