This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2018 at 17:42:44 (UTC).

1ST UNITED BANK VS HI-TECH ELECTRICAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2013 1ST UNITED BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HI-TECH ELECTRICAL, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1ST UNITED BANK

Defendants

HI-TECH ELECTRICAL, INC.

GARCIA, CARLOS

VP WAREHOUSE WEST CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATIO

KEYSTONE WIRE AND CABLE CO.

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

VALLADARES, MARELA

LAW OFFICES OF REBECA C. ALMEIDA, P. A.

SURF CONSULTANTS, INC.

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPNAY, LLC

FIA CARD SERVICES, N. A.

BANK OF AMERICA, N. A.

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II, LLC

CAPITAL ONE BANK

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION, LLC

LVNV FUNDING

RIJO GROUP, LLC

GLOBAL ACCEPTANCE CREDIT COMPANY L.P.

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEN HARRIS 111 (ESQ)

Robert T Youngs

Harris, Ben H, III

Wargo, Joseph Duane

Diaz-Noa, Ana

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander E Barthet

Assad S Mirza S

Almeida, Rebeca C.

Sprechman, Steven B

Steven J Jacobson

Other Attorneys

Kaufman, Avi R

Delia Peter

Paul David Breitner

Bruce M Boiko

 

Court Documents

Execution Issued

09/28/2015 - Execution Issued

Order on Motion to Compel

08/25/2015 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion for Garnishment

07/22/2015 - Motion for Garnishment

Writ of Garnishment Issued

07/02/2015 - Writ of Garnishment Issued

Motion to Withdraw

05/14/2015 - Motion to Withdraw

Cancellation Notice

02/03/2015 - Cancellation Notice

Request for Production

11/24/2014 - Request for Production

Request for Hearing

09/24/2014 - Request for Hearing

Letter of Correspondence

06/26/2014 - Letter of Correspondence

Letter of Correspondence

03/28/2014 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Default Not Entered

03/19/2014 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Default

03/19/2014 - Default

Service Returned

10/18/2013 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/26/2013 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/24/2013 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/20/2013 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/13/2013 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

09/04/2013 - Lis Pendens

212 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2015
  • Execution Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Execution Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIG & COPY PICKED UP BY BRENDA TAYLOR Parties: Harris Ben H III; Bruce M Boiko; Alexander E Barthet; Paul David Breitner; Sprechman Steven B; Assad S Mirza S; Steven J Jacobson; Almeida Rebeca C.; Delia Peter; Hi-Tech Electrical Inc.; Garcia Carlos; Carlos Garcia Unknown Spouse Of; Vp Warehouse West Condominium Associatio; Keystone Wire And Cable Co.; American Express Bank Fsb; Valladares Marela; Law Offices Of Rebeca C. Almeida P. A.; Surf Consultants Inc.; Progressive Express Insurance Company; Ford Motor Credit Compnay Llc; Fia Card Services N. A.; Bank Of America N. A.; American Express Centurion Bank; Worldwide Asset Purchasing Ii Llc; Capital One Bank; North Star Capital Acquisition Llc; Lvnv Funding; Rijo Group Llc; Global Acceptance Credit Company L.P.; American General Finance Inc.; Gemb Lending Inc.; Gsga Llc; National Revenue Service Inc.; First Bank Florida; Security National Insurance Company; Barclays Bank Delaware; Discover Bank; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Nco Portfolio Management Inc.; Premium Asse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Contempt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRODUCTION OF FACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • E-Filing Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: EFILE NUMBER: 5172968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Filing Fee For Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event; Comments: $ 1906.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 28808:1016; Event Type: Event; Comments: B: 28808 P: 1016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Hearing Info: Mortgage Foreclosure; Hearing Code: FORCLOSURE; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less