This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 14:08:06 (UTC).

1545 NADLAN, LLC VS. GENECIS VICTORIA AVILA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 1545 NADLAN, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GENECIS VICTORIA AVILA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1545 Nadlan, LLC

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Cabrera, Oscar

Avila, Genecis Victoria

Cabrera, Maria Isabel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kass, Mark E.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

12/21/2018 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Final Judgment

01/11/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Service Returned

12/04/2018 - Service Returned

Final Judgment by Judge

01/17/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Answer

12/10/2018 - Answer

Affidavit of Non-Payment

01/11/2019 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Notice of Mediation Conference

12/12/2018 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Memorandum of Disposition

12/21/2018 - Memorandum of Disposition

Mediators Report

12/21/2018 - Mediators Report

Service Returned

12/04/2018 - Service Returned

Writ of Possession Issued

01/22/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Service Returned

12/04/2018 - Service Returned

Stipulation

12/20/2018 - Stipulation

Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

01/03/2019 - Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

Non-Military Affidavit

12/10/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

12/10/2018 - Motion for Default

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: SENT TO SHERIFF WITH CHECK # 9607$302.00 Parties: Avila Genecis Victoria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31303:1459; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Avila Genecis Victoria; Cabrera Oscar; Cabrera Maria Isabel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non-Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: NADLAN MANAGEMENT C/O MARK EVANS KASS, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530004AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KASS, MARK E. 1497 NW 7TH ST MIAMI FL 33125-3640 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170037AMT PAID:$30.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/29/2018 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Avila Genecis Victoria; Cabrera Oscar; Cabrera Maria Isabel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Avila Genecis Victoria; Cabrera Oscar; Cabrera Maria Isabel; 1545 Nadlan LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Hearing Info: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less