This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/05/2023 at 16:25:35 (UTC).

ZAYDEE HERNANDEZ ET AL VS LEONARD MARK HOCHSTEIN M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 ZAYDEE HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LEONARD MARK HOCHSTEIN M D. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Zaydee

HERNANDEZ, JUAN

Defendants

Hochstein M.D., Leonard Mark

Leonard Hochstein, M.D., P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russomanno, Christopher Salvatore

Defendant Attorney

William V Carcioppolo

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

05/09/2022 - Request for Production

Complaint

05/09/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/09/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Interrogatory

05/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/09/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Email Notice:

05/09/2022 - Email Notice:

Order of Dismissal

03/09/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Mediators Report

02/20/2023 - Mediators Report

Notice:

02/08/2023 - Notice:

Exhibit List

02/06/2023 - Exhibit List

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

01/17/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/17/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

01/17/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/11/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/11/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

01/10/2023 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Hearing-

12/21/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

12/21/2022 - Motion to Compel

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33615:3448; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hochstein M.D. Leonard Mark; Leonard Hochstein M.D. P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF CONFLICT REGARDING TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hochstein M.D. Leonard Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160145AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE150 W FLAGLER ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33130-1560COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/10/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: HRUSSOMANNO@RUSSOMANNO.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less