This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/20/2022 at 18:12:16 (UTC).

ZAYDEE HERNANDEZ ET AL VS LEONARD MARK HOCHSTEIN M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 ZAYDEE HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LEONARD MARK HOCHSTEIN M D. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Zaydee

HERNANDEZ, JUAN

Defendants

Hochstein M.D., Leonard Mark

Leonard Hochstein, M.D., P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russomanno, Christopher Salvatore

Defendant Attorney

William V Carcioppolo

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

05/09/2022 - Request for Production

Complaint

05/09/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/09/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Interrogatory

05/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/09/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Email Notice:

05/09/2022 - Email Notice:

Order:

12/15/2022 - Order:

Case Management Report

12/15/2022 - Case Management Report

Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing

12/12/2022 - Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing

Response to Request for Production

12/12/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

12/12/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

12/12/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Subpoena Served

12/09/2022 - Subpoena Served

Subpoena Served

12/09/2022 - Subpoena Served

Subpoena Served

12/09/2022 - Subpoena Served

Subpoena Served

12/09/2022 - Subpoena Served

Subpoena Served

12/09/2022 - Subpoena Served

Subpoena Served

12/09/2022 - Subpoena Served

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Calendar Call; Hearing Code: CALND; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPROVING AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5/3/2023 @11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Subpoena Served; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Subpoena Served; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hochstein M.D. Leonard Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160145AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE150 W FLAGLER ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33130-1560COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/10/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: HRUSSOMANNO@RUSSOMANNO.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less