This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/30/2019 at 14:13:57 (UTC).

ZAPATA PALMA, PAOLA VS RODRIGUEZ-ZAPATA (DECEASED), XIMENA

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 ZAPATA PALMA, PAOLA filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ-ZAPATA DECEASED , XIMENA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Zapata Palma, Paola

Respondent

Rodriguez-Zapata (deceased), Ximena

Minor

Zapata, Matthew Felipe

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

03/28/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31383:4732; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Uncontest/diss; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Order Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: SET ON 03/28/19 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JUDGE PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice of Action - Residence Known; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Affidavit of Search Inquiry on Relatives of the Spouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210026AMT PAID:$301.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$301.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2019 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:RAMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less