This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/16/2020 at 02:39:30 (UTC).

ZAIR MEDICAL SERVICE INC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ZAIR MEDICAL SERVICE INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAIR MEDICAL SERVICE INC

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Magagnato Arratia, Patricio J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/17/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion to Dismiss

03/13/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Service of Process

03/05/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31859:1668; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740008AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$230.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2020 REGISTER#:274CASHIER:P27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580262AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.