This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 17:50:25 (UTC).

ZADOK REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC VS CITY OF MIAMI

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 ZADOK REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF MIAMI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Zadok Real Estate Holdings, LLC

Respondent

City of Miami

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pizzi, Michael A., Jr

Respondent Attorney

Greco, John A

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Certiorari

10/07/2021 - Petition for Writ of Certiorari

Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

10/12/2021 - Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

Text

10/13/2021 - Text

Notice of Appearance

10/14/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Motion:

10/26/2021 - Motion:

Order to Show Cause

12/06/2021 - Order to Show Cause

Response:

12/23/2021 - Response:

Order:

01/24/2022 - Order:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING RESPONDENT, CITY OF MIAMI'S MOTION TO TREAT "PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI" AS AN "APPEAL"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CITY OF MIAMI'S MOTION TO TREAT "PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI" AND AN "APPEAL"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATEMENT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2750002AMT PAID:$281.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3063-ADMIN APPEAL CIRCU1$281.00$281.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$281.00RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2021REGISTER#:275CASHIER:ROAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Estimated Cost Received; Event Type: Event; Comments: $281.00 FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: JACQUELINE ABU-NASSAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Writ of Certiorari; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greco, John A