This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 17:40:56 (UTC).

YOLANDA LOPEZ VS LINCOLN-MARTI COMMUNITY AGENCY, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 YOLANDA LOPEZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LINCOLN-MARTI COMMUNITY AGENCY, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lopez, Yolanda

Defendant

Lincoln-Marti Community Agency, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McGuinness, Lawrence J

Defendant Attorney

Christopher G Berga

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/22/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/22/2020 - Complaint

Notice of Appearance

02/10/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

02/14/2020 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

03/16/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lincoln-Marti Community Agency Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lincoln-Marti Community Agency Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100056AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/23/2020 REGISTER#:210CASHIER:ANDYM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lincoln-Marti Community Agency Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500189AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MCGUINNESS, LAWRENCE J MCGUINNESS & GONZALEZ, P.A. 3126 CENTER ST COCONUT GROVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN-MARTI COMMUNITY AGENCY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher G Berga