This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2020 at 08:06:54 (UTC).

Y M P CENTER COURT (LLC) VS CLAUDIA JEAN

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Y M P CENTER COURT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CLAUDIA JEAN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YMP Center Court (LLC)

Y M P Center Court (LLC)

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Jean, Claudia

Not Classified By Court

YMP Center Court LLC

Jean, Claudia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lowenhaupt

 

Court Documents

Default

03/18/2020 - Default

Non-Military Affidavit

03/13/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment

03/13/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

03/13/2020 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

03/11/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jean Claudia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2240017AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/05/2020 REGISTER#:224CASHIER:MATTIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jean Claudia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460036AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.