This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 14:42:10 (UTC).

XEROX CORPORATION VS XUMBA, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 XEROX CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against XUMBA, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xerox Corporation

Defendant

Xumba, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric B Zwiebel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/15/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/18/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/19/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

11/15/2021 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: Xumba Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010126AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ERIC B ZWIEBEL7900 PETERS RD STE B100PLANTATION FL 33324-4044COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/19/2021REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010014AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ERIC B ZWIEBEL7900 PETERS RD STE B100PLANTATION FL 33324-4044COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:10/19/2021REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XEROX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zwiebel, Eric Bret