This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/18/2023 at 03:37:10 (UTC).

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST VS JAKDAY ALBAREZ

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAKDAY ALBAREZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wsfs, Fsb, As Trustee For Cvi Amr Investment Trust

Defendant

Albarez, Jakday

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/14/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/20/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/08/2023 - Service Returned

Non-Military Affidavit

04/28/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion:

04/28/2023 - Motion:

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Albarez Jakday

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Albarez Jakday

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150011AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JUAN G ANDREU1000 NW 57TH CT STE 400MIAMI FL 33126-3292COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080056AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:JUAN G ANDREU1000 NW 57TH CT STE 400MIAMI FL 33126-3292COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:02/17/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less