This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/16/2022 at 02:24:12 (UTC).

WONDER MUSE, LLC ET AL VS PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 WONDER MUSE, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PMA VENTURE CAPITAL GROUP, LLC

WONDER MUSE, LLC

MUSE SUNNY ISLES BEACH 4002, INC

Defendants

PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC.

RLS 4000 LLC

SCHMULIAN, MARC D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lustig, Daniel

Kravets, Aleksandra, ESQ

David Stone

Defendant Attorney

Rubens, Josh M

 

Court Documents

Motion to Disqualify

01/23/2020 - Motion to Disqualify

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/30/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Motion

01/06/2020 - Response to Motion

Notice of Production

12/09/2019 - Notice of Production

Plaintiff's Certificate of Settlement Authority

02/10/2020 - Plaintiff's Certificate of Settlement Authority

Motion for Extension of Time

10/04/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

09/11/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Order:

10/18/2019 - Order:

Notice of Filing:

07/29/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Order of Dismissal

07/07/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

06/26/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Lis Pendens

07/29/2019 - Lis Pendens

Order of Dismissal

10/13/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

10/13/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Mediators Report

10/09/2020 - Mediators Report

Stipulation for Dismissal

10/08/2020 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Memorandum of Law

10/05/2020 - Memorandum of Law

Plaintiff's Certificate of Settlement Authority

10/05/2020 - Plaintiff's Certificate of Settlement Authority

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32148:3886; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: THE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Law; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Plaintiff's Certificate of Settlement Authority; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN OPPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490009AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LUSTIG, DANIEL2465 MERCER AVE STE 204WEST PALM BEACH FL 33401-7449COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/20/2019REGISTER#:349CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXIBIT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rubens, Josh M