This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 05:30:48 (UTC).

WOLF, KENNETH VS PUERTA, ANGISAN MAJIA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 WOLF, KENNETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PUERTA, ANGISAN MAJIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wolf, Kenneth

Respondent

Puerta, Angisan Majia

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

12/12/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 22-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31741:3422; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECEMBER 12, 2019 AT 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Puerta Angisan Majia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800019AMT PAID:$459.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Issued for Sheriff Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: MIAMI DADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.