This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:39:29 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY VS EDGEWATER SQUARE MANOR LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIAB ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY filed an Other lawsuit against EDGEWATER SQUARE MANOR LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIAB. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wilmington Savings Fund Society

Irp Fund II Trust 2A

Defendants

Edgewater Square Manor Llc A Florida Limited Liab

Ocon, David A

Porras, Claudia Maria

Bay Park Towers Condominium Association Inc

Frontela, Niuver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Vanslette

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/06/2022 - Complaint

Notice:

06/06/2022 - Notice:

Lis Pendens

06/07/2022 - Lis Pendens

Certificate of Possession of Note

06/06/2022 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/06/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Answer

06/29/2022 - Answer

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: Bay Park Towers Condominium Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: Frontela Niuver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: Edgewater Square Manor Llc A Florida Limited Liab

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190314AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:JASON VANSLETTE10360 W STATE ROAD 84FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33324-4237COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33227:2707; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bay Park Towers Condominium Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where IRP Fund II Trust 2A is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanslette, Jason Michael