This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 21:13:37 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB VS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA- DEPARTMENT OF HUD

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA- DEPARTMENT OF HUD. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb

Defendants

United States Of America- Department of HUD

Mareus (Estate of) (Deceased), Gloria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ullman, Zachary Y, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/14/2022 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

06/14/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Email Notice:

06/14/2022 - Email Notice:

Lis Pendens

06/15/2022 - Lis Pendens

Summons Returned - No Service

07/29/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/29/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

07/29/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2400026AMT PAID:$30.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:06/21/2022REGISTER#:240CASHIER:CASSEUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United States Of America- Department of HUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020088AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y, ESQ5300 ATLANTIC AVE, SUITE 303DELRAY BEACH FL 33484-8141COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33243:3334; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICEMAIL@ALDRIDGEPITE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.