This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/11/2022 at 17:04:37 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS OWNER TRUST VS IVAN FUENTES POMARES ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS OWNER TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IVAN FUENTES POMARES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS OWNER TRUST

Defendants

FUENTES POMARES, IVAN

GRAU, MORELLA

VARMO CONSTRUCTION, LLC

ENERGY (PACE) DISTRICT, GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSN, INC

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

GYVES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manganelli, Melisa

Defendant Attorney

Brian W Pariser

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

12/09/2021 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Filing:

11/17/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Motion:

11/17/2021 - Motion:

Order of Dismissal

11/17/2021 - Order of Dismissal

Summons Returned - No Service

10/29/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

10/29/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

10/29/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/29/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/29/2021 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

09/15/2021 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Certificate of Possession of Note

09/14/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Complaint

09/14/2021 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

09/14/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/14/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/14/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND FORBEARANCE MODIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE WITH RESERVATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32862:3550; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE WITH RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT OF THE STIPULATION AND FORBEARANCE/MODIFICATION AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: NON-SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2. NON SERVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSN INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN ENERGY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32748:241; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less