This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 12:46:13 (UTC).

WIDOM CHIROPRACTIC OFFICES PA VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/20/2023 WIDOM CHIROPRACTIC OFFICES PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Widom Chiropractic Offices PA

Assignor

Etienne, Valerie

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/20/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

02/20/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

02/20/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/20/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

02/20/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/07/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

03/14/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

04/03/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Filing:

04/03/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

04/03/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

04/03/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190187AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/08/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170004AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less