This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 13:36:24 (UTC).

WEST ORANGE WELLNESS & INJURY CENTER VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 WEST ORANGE WELLNESS INJURY CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Orange Wellness & Injury Center

Assignor

Reece, Alicia

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

Defendant Attorney

Brock, Rebecca L, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

04/10/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response:

03/28/2023 - Response:

Response to Request for Production

03/28/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

03/28/2023 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Admissions

03/27/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

03/10/2023 - Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/06/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

02/23/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

02/17/2023 - Request for Production

Witness and Exhibit List

02/17/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice:

01/09/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/09/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/09/2023 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

01/09/2023 - Statement of Claim

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110024AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040027AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3,653.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less