*************P-21
01/09/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miami-Dade, Florida
West Orange Wellness & Injury Center
Reece, Alicia
Progressive Select Insurance Company
Patino, Richard
Brock, Rebecca L, ESQ
04/10/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions
03/28/2023 - Response:
03/28/2023 - Response to Request for Production
03/28/2023 - Privilege Log
03/27/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions
03/10/2023 - Request for Admissions
03/06/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense
02/23/2023 - Notice of Appearance
02/17/2023 - Request for Production
02/17/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List
02/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
01/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
01/09/2023 - Notice:
01/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
01/09/2023 - Request for Production
01/09/2023 - Request for Admissions
01/09/2023 - Statement of Claim
DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110024AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040027AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3,653.60
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1
[-] Read Less