This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/26/2023 at 09:28:44 (UTC).

WEST COAST SERVICING, INC. VS TOMAS DIAZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 WEST COAST SERVICING, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TOMAS DIAZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST COAST SERVICING, INC.

Defendants

DIAZ, TOMAS

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

CITY OF HIALEAH

MIAMI DADE COUNTY BUILDING & NEIGHBORHOOD COMP

JACOB FRANZ DYCK, TRUSTEE OF THE JACOB FRANZ DYCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashland Roberts (esq)

 

Court Documents

Notice of Bankruptcy

01/09/2023 - Notice of Bankruptcy

Affidavit of Diligent Search

01/09/2023 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Affidavit of Diligent Search

01/09/2023 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Answer

01/03/2023 - Answer

Notice of Appearance

01/03/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Summons Returned - No Service

12/29/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

12/29/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/29/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

12/29/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

11/30/2022 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

11/30/2022 - Complaint

Letter of Correspondence

11/30/2022 - Letter of Correspondence

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Bankruptcy; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: TOMAS DIAZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TOMAS DIAZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33486:4343; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less