This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 04:48:44 (UTC).

WENZEL, PETER VS WENZEL, KRISTINE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 WENZEL, PETER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WENZEL, KRISTINE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wenzel, Peter

Respondent

Wenzel, Kristine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hasner, Marlene L.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

12/12/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 20-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31741:3710; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12-12-19 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/31/19 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580039AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:HASNER, MARLENE L. 2250 SW 3 AVE STE 302 MIAMI FL 33129-2065 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Marital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less