This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/27/2021 at 01:38:14 (UTC).

WENCESLADO REYES VS ERIK ALFAU ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 WENCESLADO REYES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERIK ALFAU. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES, WENCESLADO

Defendants

ALL SMOOTH LAWN MAINTENANCE & LANDSCAPING INC

ALFAU, ERIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burlington, Kent J., ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan G Liss

Jaime J Baca

 

Court Documents

Notice of Production

02/08/2021 - Notice of Production

Request for Copies

01/04/2021 - Request for Copies

Answer

06/03/2020 - Answer

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

11/09/2020 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

AgreedOrder

01/25/2021 - AgreedOrder

Motion to Show Cause

10/14/2020 - Motion to Show Cause

Notice of Interrogatory

06/09/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Certificate of No Objections to Production

07/13/2020 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

AgreedOrder

01/25/2021 - AgreedOrder

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: (CORRECTED ORDER) ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENIED MOTION TO ENFORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHOWING CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALFAU ERIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2390195AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BURLINGTON, KENT J., ESQ GOLDBERG & ROSEN, P.A. 1111 BRICKELL AVENUE, SUITE MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/22/2020 REGISTER#:239CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL SMOOTH LAWN MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burlington, Kent J., ESQ