This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/15/2022 at 01:27:40 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS RICHARD J LUNG (DBA) ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RICHARD J LUNG DBA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Wachovia Bank National Association

Defendants

Lung (dba), Richard J

Lung, Richard J

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Lung (MD) (PLLC), Richard J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thornton, Jay

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/02/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

11/03/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

11/03/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/03/2022 - Request for Production

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Lung (dba) Richard J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Lung Richard J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160124AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:THORNTON, JAYREED SMITH LLP 200 BISCAYNE BLVD SUITE 2600MIAMI FL 33131-2191COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:11/05/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090064AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:THORNTON, JAYREED SMITH LLP 200 BISCAYNE BLVD SUITE 2600MIAMI FL 33131-2191COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/04/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wachovia Bank, National Assn is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES THORNTON