This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/01/2023 at 02:37:19 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS LILIA GASSET ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LILIA GASSET. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Defendants

Gasset, Lilia

Gasset, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

01/25/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/19/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/19/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/18/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/18/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

01/18/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/18/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Order Setting CM Deadline

01/09/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COMPLETED CASE SCHEDULING/MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CARLOS GASSET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LILIA GASSET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: Gasset Lilia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100026AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360BOCA RATON FL 33431-7780COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:01/04/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33528:4255; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less