Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/17/2021 at 03:55:40 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK (NA) VS KEVIN G RIVERA

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEVIN G RIVERA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank (NA)

Defendant

Rivera, Kevin G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Naderpour, Amir

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

07/06/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

06/22/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/10/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim

06/10/2021 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

06/10/2021 - Email Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rivera Kevin G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060152AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/25/2021 REGISTER#:206CASHIER:SERRAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rivera Kevin G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640511AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:NADERPOUR, AMIR 1000 W. MCNAB ROAD 3RD FLOOR POMPANO BEACH FL 33069 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2021 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE1@NADERPOURLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $6092.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR