Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/17/2021 at 09:26:55 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS ASHLEY PALENZUELA

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASHLEY PALENZUELA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Defendant

Palenzuela, Ashley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Naderpour, Amir

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

07/13/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

06/23/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/10/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice:

06/10/2021 - Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110052AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/24/2021 REGISTER#:211CASHIER:MARLNEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Palenzuela Ashley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630042AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:NADERPOUR, AMIR 1000 W. MCNAB ROAD 3RD FLOOR POMPANO BEACH FL 33069 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR