This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/04/2023 at 00:11:27 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS GUILLERMO DAUSA ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GUILLERMO DAUSA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Defendants

Dausa, Guillermo

Dausa, Gianna

Daussa, Gianna

Dausa Diaz, Gianna

United States Of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Lis Pendens

12/21/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice:

12/20/2022 - Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

12/20/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: United States Of America

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: Dausa Gianna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Dausa Gianna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110212AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360BOCA RATON FL 33431-7780COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:12/22/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33516:1714; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less