This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 18:02:12 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS ALEXANDER GUZMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALEXANDER GUZMAN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Defendants

Guzman, Alexander

Lopez, Matie

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

Cach Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Document

01/17/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

01/17/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

01/03/2023 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

12/30/2022 - Notice:

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33549:883; Event Type: Event; Comments: & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Parties: Guzman Alexander; Lopez Matie; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Cach Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 16. Parties: Guzman Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: Guzman Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: Guzman Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100035AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360BOCA RATON FL 33431-7780COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:01/04/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33528:4273; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less