This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 09:43:41 (UTC).

WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION LLC VS SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 WEBB ROOFING CONSTRUCTION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION LLC

Assignors

BENITEZ, COSME

BENITEZ, ANGELICA

Defendant

SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Canaura, Jose M

Low, David

Defendant Attorney

Rodriguez, Orlando A., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/01/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/01/2021 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

07/01/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

07/01/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/01/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/13/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

08/06/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

08/11/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

08/12/2021 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Motion for Extension of Time

09/16/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/29/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY Parties: SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Canaura Jose M; WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES Parties: Rodriguez Orlando A. ESQ; SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040072AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LOW, DAVID 2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/17/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090384AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LOW, DAVID 2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/07/2021 REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less