This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/20/2021 at 09:39:41 (UTC).

WAYNE ALLEN VS M.C.I. EXPRESS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 WAYNE ALLEN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against M C I EXPRESS, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen, Wayne

Defendants

M.C.I. EXPRESS, INC.

MCI EXPRESS TRANSPORT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hoogerwoerd, Peter

Defendant Attorneys

Mathis, Brian K

Jessica L Klein (esq)

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

08/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/02/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

08/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/16/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

04/22/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/17/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/17/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jessica L Klein (esq); M.C.I. EXPRESS INC.; MCI EXPRESS TRANSPORT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: M.C.I. EXPRESS INC.; MCI EXPRESS TRANSPORT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MCI EXPRESS TRANSPORT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: M.C.I. EXPRESS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540214AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:HOOGERWOERD, PETER 44 W FLAGLER ST FL 22 MIAMI FL 33130-1808 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2021 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550078AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:HOOGERWOERD, PETER 44 W FLAGLER ST FL 22 MIAMI FL 33130-1808 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M C I Express is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hoogerwoerd, Peter