Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/03/2021 at 00:24:38 (UTC).

WATER TECH RESTORATION (LLC) VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INS CORP

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 WATER TECH RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INS CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Water Tech Restoration (LLC)

Assignor

Baires, Luis

Defendant

Citizens Property Ins Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Holly K

Defendant Attorney

Bechert, Charles H., III

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/02/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/02/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Interrogatory

03/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

03/02/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

03/02/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/02/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Email Notice:

03/19/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

03/19/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

03/10/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/03/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAILSERVICE@SOUTHFLORIDAATTORNEY.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570048AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MILLER, HOLLY K KORIN LAW P.A. 80 SW 8TH STREET SUITE 2000 MIAMI FL 33130 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/04/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570030AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MILLER, HOLLY K KORIN LAW P.A. 80 SW 8TH STREET SUITE 2000 MIAMI FL 33130 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/04/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Ins Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $15000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Water Tech Restoration (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bechert, Charles H, III