This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 18:38:01 (UTC).

WATER DRYOUT (LLC) VS SCOTTSDALE INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 WATER DRYOUT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Water Dryout (LLC)

Assignors

Guerra Avila, Angel Arnoldo

Ramirez Vera, Lourdes

Defendant

Scottsdale Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hara, Jesse L

Defendant Attorney

Mejia, Nicia C, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/20/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/20/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Appearance

04/06/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/07/2022 - Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

04/11/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

04/25/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070009AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2022REGISTER#:207CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030313AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE LP.O BOX 16783PLANTATION FL 33318COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/21/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3762.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATER DRYOUT LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHELLE EDWARDS is a litigant

Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Hara, Jesse L