This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/19/2022 at 06:45:14 (UTC).

WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BLANCO ROSA SOCORRO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against BLANCO ROSA SOCORRO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wachovia Bank National Association

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Socorro, Blanco Rosa

Hernandez, Felix Raul

State of Florida (The)

Harvey Ruvin Clerk of the Court Miami Dade County

F.R.H. & Associates Inc

CACH LLC

Green Gulf Group Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stevens, Adam Jeffrey

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/27/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/27/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice:

09/14/2022 - Notice:

Motion for Default

09/14/2022 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

09/08/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/08/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

09/08/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

09/08/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

09/07/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

09/07/2022 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Diligent Search

09/07/2022 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Order:

09/03/2022 - Order:

Email Notice:

08/30/2022 - Email Notice:

Answer

08/30/2022 - Answer

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/13/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Service Returned

08/13/2022 - Service Returned

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070482AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:STEVENS, ADAM JEFFREY4575 VIA ROYALE STE 200FORT MYERS FL 33919-1018COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 29. Parties: CACH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Green Gulf Group Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090008AMT PAID:$45.00NAME:STEVENS, ADAM JEFFREY4575 VIA ROYALE STE 200FORT MYERS FL 33919-1018COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$45.00RECEIPT DATE:08/05/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000090AMT PAID:$406.00NAME:STEVENS, ADAM JEFFREY4575 VIA ROYALE STE 200FORT MYERS FL 33919-1018COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$406.00RECEIPT DATE:07/30/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wachovia Bank, National Assn is a litigant

Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stevens, Adam Jeffrey