Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/02/2021 at 10:34:18 (UTC).

V&J KINGDOM HOLDINGS, LLC. VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 V J KINGDOM HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

V&J Kingdom Holdings, LLC.

Defendant

Security First Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hannon, James A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

06/24/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/10/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

06/10/2021 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

06/10/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/10/2021 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670014AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:HANNON, JAMES A. HANNON LEGAL GROUP PA 9155 SOUTH DADELAND BLVD SUI MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2021 REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650117AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:HANNON, JAMES A. HANNON LEGAL GROUP PA 9155 SOUTH DADELAND BLVD SUI MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannon, James A.