This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/13/2022 at 06:25:05 (UTC).

VIVIAN QUINTERO VS CHARLES M. ROWARS, AS TRUSTEE D/B/A PELICAN BAYS

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 VIVIAN QUINTERO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES M ROWARS, AS TRUSTEE D/B/A PELICAN BAYS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINTERO, VIVIAN

Defendant

CHARLES M. ROWARS, as Trustee d/b/a PELICAN BAYS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mendez, Sergio L.

Defendant Attorneys

Jon A Hinden

Shawn D Arbeiter

 

Court Documents

Order:

10/13/2020 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

09/03/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Attorneys Fees

08/21/2020 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Memorandum of Disposition

10/08/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

09/04/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

06/25/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Complaint

12/26/2019 - Complaint

Notice of Hearing-

07/08/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Change of Venue

06/25/2020 - Motion for Change of Venue

Satisfaction of Judgment

09/20/2021 - Satisfaction of Judgment

Order Awarding Attorney Fees

09/01/2021 - Order Awarding Attorney Fees

Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:

08/11/2021 - Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

04/30/2021 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Reply

04/29/2021 - Reply

Response:

04/19/2021 - Response:

Memorandum of Disposition

04/07/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice:

04/05/2021 - Notice:

Notice of Hearing-

02/09/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Satisfaction of Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Awarding Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQSPONSE ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Quash; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF EDUARDO R. LACASA ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2340043AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:AMERICAN EXPRESSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/02/2020REGISTER#:234CASHIER:IDELKYG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CHARLES M. ROWARS as Trustee d/b/a PELICAN BAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460117AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MENDEZ, SERGIO L.7400 SW 57TH CT # 202SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5303COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2019REGISTER#:346CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less